MO SB852 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to emergency service providers, corporate security advisors, child abuse, the Department of Mental Health, and funerals
Title
Modifies provisions relating to emergency service providers, corporate security advisors, child abuse, the Department of Mental Health, and funerals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2014-05-16 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (5816S05.1SR) |
2014-05-15 | House | H submits CCR |
2014-05-15 | House | S conferees appointed: Schmitt, Dixon, Silvey, Curls, Keaveny |
2014-05-15 | House | H conferees appointed: Rhoads, Hinson, Rizzo |
2014-05-15 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2014-05-15 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2014-05-15 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2014-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-14 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2014-05-14 | House | HSA 1 for HA 8 H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(5816H04.34H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered (Conway)--(5816H04.24H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black)--(5816H04.17H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Riddle)--(5816H04.33H) |
2014-05-14 | House | Bill Laid over |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered (Schatz)--(5816H04.25H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(5816H04.16H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Torpey)--(5816H04.22H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wilson)--(5816H04.23H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rowden)--(5816H04.15H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rhoads)--(5816H04.06H) |
2014-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-17 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-03-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee (5816S.02C) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-02-10 | Senate | S First Read--SB 852-Schmitt |