MO SB848 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits state agencies from collecting fees or penalties until all administrative remedies have been exhausted
Title
Prohibits state agencies from collecting fees or penalties until all administrative remedies have been exhausted
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |