MO SB825 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits customers of electric utilities from subsidizing electric vehicle charging stations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits customers of electric utilities from subsidizing electric vehicle charging stations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateHearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2020-02-13SenateSecond Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 825-Libla
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback