MO SB81 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 81-Dixon
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 81-Dixon
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions stating that community service alternatives used by municipal courts must be offered at no cost to the defendant
Title
Repeals provisions stating that community service alternatives used by municipal courts must be offered at no cost to the defendant
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 81-Dixon |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 81-Dixon |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57095399 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB81.pdf |