MO SB808 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of law relating to the licensure and scope of practice for certain professions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions of law relating to the licensure and scope of practice for certain professions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-10SenateSigned by Governor
2014-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-01SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-01HouseS Third Read and Passed
2014-05-01HouseS concurs in HCS, as amended
2014-04-30HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-04-30HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2014-04-30HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Burlison)--(5659H07.06H)
2014-04-28HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-28HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-22HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-22HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee
2014-04-17HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee
2014-04-16HouseHearing Conducted H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee
2014-04-08HouseReferred H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee
2014-03-31HouseH Second Read
2014-03-27HouseH First Read
2014-03-27SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2014-03-27SenateSCS S adopted
2014-03-13SenateReported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
2014-03-10SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted (5659S.02C)
2014-03-10SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee (5659S.02C)
2014-03-04SenateHearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
2014-02-20SenateSecond Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
2014-01-30SenateS First Read--SB 808-Wasson

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback