MO SB807 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 807-Dempsey
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 807-Dempsey
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to the Second Injury Fund
Title
Modifies the law relating to the Second Injury Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Dempsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 807-Dempsey | |
2012-04-10 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-04-05 | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor | |
2012-04-03 | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2012-02-23 | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2012-02-16 | S First Read--SB 807-Dempsey |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2024258 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB807.pdf |