MO SB802 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 802-Hegeman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 802-Hegeman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the use of public funds by school districts or district employees in elections
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the use of public funds by school districts or district employees in elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 802-Hegeman |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 802-Hegeman |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27838058 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB802.pdf |