MO SB796 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals an annual mileage limitation applicable to historic motor vehicles
Title
Repeals an annual mileage limitation applicable to historic motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |