MO SB794 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Hearing Conducted S Fiscal Oversight Committee
Pending: Senate Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Hearing Conducted S Fiscal Oversight Committee
Pending: Senate Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a tax credit for providing services to homeless persons
Title
Authorizes a tax credit for providing services to homeless persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |