MO SB793 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 793-Richard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 793-Richard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to civil actions brought under merchandising practices and products liability provisions of law
Title
Modifies provisions relating to civil actions brought under merchandising practices and products liability provisions of law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 793-Richard |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 793-Richard |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22459625 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB793.pdf |