MO SB788 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SCS for SB 788-Schatz (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SCS for SB 788-Schatz (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that municipalities in the St. Louis County sales tax pool receive at least 50% of the revenue generated inside a given municipality
Title
Requires that municipalities in the St. Louis County sales tax pool receive at least 50% of the revenue generated inside a given municipality
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SCS for SB 788-Schatz (In Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-05-02 | Senate | SS for SCS S adopted |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-25 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Chappelle-Nadal)--(4741S12.01F) |
2016-04-25 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Schatz)--(4741S.12F) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee w/SCS |
2016-03-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (4741S.09C) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 788-Schatz |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled |