MO SB782 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows an individual with certification from the American Board for Certification of Teacher Excellence to obtain teacher certification in elementary education
Title
Allows an individual with certification from the American Board for Certification of Teacher Excellence to obtain teacher certification in elementary education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-02 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-02 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-03-31 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Romine)--(5634S.02F) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 782-Romine |