MO SB780 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2018-05-11 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2018-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2018-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred H Judiciary |
2018-03-08 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 780-Curls |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled |