MO SB78 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 78-Lamping, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 78-Lamping, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts General Assembly members from acting as lobbyists
Title
Restricts General Assembly members from acting as lobbyists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 78-Lamping, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-01 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Justus)--(8007S13.01S) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Lamping)--(0376S.09F) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-04-09 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee - (0376S.06C) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 78-Lamping |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |