MO SB774 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 774-Schmitt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 774-Schmitt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the gubernatorial appointment process for acting directors and members of boards and commissions
Title
Modifies the gubernatorial appointment process for acting directors and members of boards and commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 774-Schmitt |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 774-Schmitt |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22265058 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB774.pdf |