MO SB77 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the actuarial amortization and cost methods for the Missouri State Employees' Retirement System and the Missouri Department of Transportation and Highway Patrol Employees' Retirement System
Title
Modifies the actuarial amortization and cost methods for the Missouri State Employees' Retirement System and the Missouri Department of Transportation and Highway Patrol Employees' Retirement System
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |