MO SB767 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to wagering on certain games
Title
Modifies provisions relating to wagering on certain games
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee (4671S.05C) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 767-Hoskins |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB767.pdf |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/comm/SB767.pdf |