MO SB758 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 758-Wasson, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 758-Wasson, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to children
Title
Modifies provisions relating to children
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Black [R] | Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 758-Wasson, with HCS, as amended | |
2012-05-17 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-17 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-17 | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (May)--(5601L04.08H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 7 to HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-17 | HA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schieber)--(5601L04.24H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 7 to HCS H offered (Johnson)--(5601L04.10H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Elmer)--(5601L04.04H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sommer)--(5601L04.12H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (McManus)--(5601L04.23H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fraker)--(5601L04.01F) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-89)--(5601L04.14F) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black)--(5601L04.13H) | |
2012-05-16 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-16 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-15 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-15 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Purusant Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-03 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Children and Families Committee | |
2012-05-02 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Children and Families Committee | |
2012-05-02 | Hearing Conducted H Children and Families Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Referred H Children and Families Committee | |
2012-04-23 | H Second Read | |
2012-04-19 | H First Read | |
2012-04-19 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-04-18 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-04-18 | Perfected | |
2012-04-18 | SCS S adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-04-12 | Reported from S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-04-03 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee - 5601S.02C | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2012-02-09 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2012-02-07 | S First Read--SB 758-Wasson |