MO SB741 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-14 - Governor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes gaming establishment to provide lines of credit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes gaming establishment to provide lines of credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-14HouseGovernor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30HouseReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-04-29HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-04-29HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-04-24HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-24HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-22HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-22HouseReported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
2014-04-17HouseVoted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
2014-04-15HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
2014-04-08HouseReferred H General Laws Committee
2014-04-03HouseH Second Read
2014-04-02HouseH First Read
2014-04-02SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-04-01SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-04-01SenatePerfected
2014-04-01SenateSS S offered & adopted (Rupp and Parson)--(5408S.03F)
2014-03-25SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-03-13SenateReported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor
2014-02-18SenateVoted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-02-11SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-02-06SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-16SenateS First Read--SB 741-Rupp

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback