MO SB739 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the top rate of income tax
Title
Reduces the top rate of income tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |