MO SB736 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Program
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Program
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-01-16 | Senate | S First Read--SB 736-Sater |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28374859 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB736.pdf |