MO SB730 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 730-Wallingford, with SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 730-Wallingford, with SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rate Case Modernization Act
Title
Establishes the Rate Case Modernization Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 730-Wallingford, with SCS & SA 1 (pending) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Libla)--(4491S02.01F) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS |
2018-01-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (4491S.02C) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 730-Wallingford |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |