MO SB730 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Boone County to adopt regulations to control the minimum standards of occupancy for residential units and to develop a program for licensing and inspecting the units
Title
Allows Boone County to adopt regulations to control the minimum standards of occupancy for residential units and to develop a program for licensing and inspecting the units
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2012-02-01 | S First Read--SB 730-Schaefer |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=984763 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB730.pdf |