MO SB729 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation and economic development
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation and economic development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2014-05-16 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (5108S07.1SR) |
2014-05-15 | House | H submits CCR |
2014-05-15 | House | S conferees appointed: Romine, Schmitt, Brown, Keaveny, Nasheed |
2014-05-15 | House | H conferees appointed: Lauer, Fitzwater, Kratky |
2014-05-15 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2014-05-15 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2014-05-15 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, as amended & HA 4 |
2014-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 4 H offered & adopted (Korman)--(5108S04.11H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 3, as amended, H adopted |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(5108S04.17H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 3 H offered (McGaugh)--(5108S04.14H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(5108S04..05H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(5108S04.01H) |
2014-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Economic Development Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Voted Do Pass H Economic Development Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Economic Development Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred H Economic Development Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-10 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-02 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - Consent vote adopted (5108S.04C) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (5108S.04C) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-15 | Senate | S First Read--SB 729-Romine |