MO SB72 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain health care providers may have their professional licenses disciplined for failure to follow the CDC Guideline for Prescribing Opioids
Title
Provides that certain health care providers may have their professional licenses disciplined for failure to follow the CDC Guideline for Prescribing Opioids
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 72-Schaaf |
2016-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57095428 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB72.pdf |