MO SB718 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to military affairs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to military affairs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-14 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27HouseDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27HouseSigned by House Speaker
2020-05-27HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2020-05-27HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2020-05-14HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2020-05-14HouseH Third Read and Passed
2020-05-14HouseHCS H defeated
2020-05-12HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-05-11HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-11HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-08HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2020-05-08HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-08HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-06HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Veterans
2020-05-04HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Veterans
2020-05-04HouseHearing Conducted H Veterans
2020-04-28HouseReferred H Veterans
2020-03-10HouseH Second Read
2020-03-09HouseH First Read
2020-03-09SenateS Third Read and Passed
2020-03-09SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-03-09SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-03-04SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-03-04SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2020-03-03SenatePerfected
2020-03-03SenateSS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2020-03-03SenateSA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(4078S04.03S)
2020-03-03SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(4078S04.02S)
2020-03-03SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(4078S04.01S)
2020-03-03SenateSS for SCS S offered (White)--(4078S.04F)
2020-02-13SenateReported from S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee w/SCS
2020-02-11SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee (4078S.03C)
2020-02-04SenateHearing Conducted S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
2020-01-30SenateSecond Read and Referred S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 718-White
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback