MO SB716 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions of law relating to transportation and the regulation of motor vehicles
Title
Modifies several provisions of law relating to transportation and the regulation of motor vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] | Sen. Jack Goodman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-04-29 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2010-04-29 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2010-04-13 | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Referred H Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-01 | H Second Read | |
2010-02-25 | H First Read | |
2010-02-25 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-02-24 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Perfected | |
2010-02-18 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor | |
2010-02-15 | Removed S Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor - Consent | |
2010-02-10 | Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee - Consent | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 716-Goodman | |
2009-12-22 | Prefiled |