MO SB710 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
Pending: Senate Small Business, Insurance And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that an applicant for a navigator license must take an exam created by the Department of Insurance and submit to a criminal background check

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that an applicant for a navigator license must take an exam created by the Department of Insurance and submit to a criminal background check

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-01SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2016-01-11SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2016-01-06SenateS First Read--SB 710-Parson
2015-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback