MO SB71 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0327S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0327S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Higher Education to establish a reimbursement procedure through the A+ Program for a student's portion of fees for dual credit courses
Title
Requires the Department of Higher Education to establish a reimbursement procedure through the A+ Program for a student's portion of fees for dual credit courses
Sponsors
Sen. Paul LeVota [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0327S.03C) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 71-LeVota |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=25 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB71.pdf |