MO SB693 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 693-Crowell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 693-Crowell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits state agencies from printing calendars representing the agency to public and private entities
Title
Prohibits state agencies from printing calendars representing the agency to public and private entities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 693-Crowell | |
2012-03-20 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-03-20 | Taken up for Perfection | |
2012-03-01 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-22 | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2012-01-24 | S First Read--SB 693-Crowell |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=542301 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB693.pdf |