MO SB692 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Defeated on H Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Defeated on H Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Defeated on H Third Reading | |
2012-05-16 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-16 | HA 15 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cookson)--(5469L04.43H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bahr)--(5469L04.44H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(5469L04.39H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Talboy)--(5469L04.62H) | |
2012-05-16 | HSA 1 for HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Nolte)--(5469L04.88H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 11 to HCS H offered (Gatschenberger)--(5469L04.33H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelly-24)--(5469L04.84H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hummel)--(5469L04.40H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cierpiot)--(5469L04.85H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Stream)--(5469L04.01F) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lasater)--(5469L04.01H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schatz)--(5469L04.02F) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Scharnhorst)--(5469L04.83H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-89)--(5469L04.53H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-89)--(5469L04.35H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gatschenberger)--(5469L04.79H) | |
2012-05-15 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-15 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-14 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Purusant Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-03 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee | |
2012-05-02 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee | |
2012-04-25 | Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Referred H Local Government Committee | |
2012-04-10 | H Second Read | |
2012-04-05 | H First Read | |
2012-04-05 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-04-03 | Perfected | |
2012-04-03 | SCS S adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-02-22 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - (5469S.02C) | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2012-01-24 | S First Read--SB 692-Stouffer |