MO SB683 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to child care
Title
Modifies provisions relating to child care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-13 - House - House: SB 683 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-13 - House - House: SB 683 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-13 - House - House: SB 683 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 0 N: 140 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-13 - House - House: SB 683 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-13 - House - House: SB 683 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 0 N: 140 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-05-18 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2022-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2022-05-13 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2022-05-13 | House | HCS H defeated |
2022-05-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-05-13 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-05-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2022-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-05 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2022-05-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2022-04-28 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2022-04-27 | House | Hearing Cencelled H Judiciary |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred H Judiciary |
2022-04-21 | House | H Second Read |
2022-04-20 | House | H First Read |
2022-04-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Perfected |
2022-04-12 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2022-04-12 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & ruled out of order (Schupp)--(4097S05.09S) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Point of order - SA 2 to SS for SCS goes Beyond Scope - Brattin |
2022-04-12 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (May)--(4097S05.06S) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(4097S05.03S) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (O'Laughlin)--(4097S.05F) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee w/SCS |
2022-02-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee (4097S.02C) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Hearing to be Continued S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |