MO SB681 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a process for the Parole Board to review the case histories of offenders serving more than 15 years in prison and recommend clemency or allow release on parole
Title
Provides a process for the Parole Board to review the case histories of offenders serving more than 15 years in prison and recommend clemency or allow release on parole
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 681-Curls |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28134414 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB681.pdf |