MO SB676 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 676-Nieves, with SCA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 676-Nieves, with SCA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies how courts may rule in contractual disputes involving the law of other countries and jurisdictional issues involving other countries
Title
Specifies how courts may rule in contractual disputes involving the law of other countries and jurisdictional issues involving other countries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 676-Nieves, with SCA 1 (pending) | |
2012-03-21 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-03-21 | Taken up for Perfection | |
2012-03-08 | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCA 1 | |
2012-02-28 | Voted Do Pass (w/SCA#1) S General Laws Committee - (5282S01.01S) | |
2012-02-21 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2012-01-17 | S First Read--SB 676-Nieves |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=258830 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB676.pdf |