MO SB670 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 670-Hough, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 670-Hough, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to athletic trainers
Title
Modifies provisions relating to athletic trainers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 670-Hough, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Point of order - Not Well Taken |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Point of order (Eigel) - SS/SCS goes beyond scope of original bill - point of order taken under advisement |
2020-02-24 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (May)--(3184S07.05S) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Hough)--(3184S.07F) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee w/SCS |
2020-02-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (3184S.04C) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 670-Hough |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |