MO SB669 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 669-Schaaf
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 669-Schaaf
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates "jumping jacks" as the official exercise of the state of Missouri
Title
Designates "jumping jacks" as the official exercise of the state of Missouri
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 669-Schaaf |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee to Floor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee to Floor - Consent |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 669-Schaaf |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28134650 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB669.pdf |