MO SB669 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - Hearing Cancelled S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - Hearing Cancelled S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the retirement plans for judges, statewide elected officials, and members of the General Assembly who first take office after January 1, 2013
Title
Modifies the retirement plans for judges, statewide elected officials, and members of the General Assembly who first take office after January 1, 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Lembke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Hearing Cancelled S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee | |
2012-01-17 | S First Read--SB 669-Lembke |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=258505 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB669.pdf |