MO SB661 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the statute specifying when police officers are justified using force
Title
Modifies the statute specifying when police officers are justified using force
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] | Sen. Shalonn Curls [D] | Rep. Caleb Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2016-05-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-05-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-05-05 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/HCA 1 |
2016-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/Amendments |
2016-04-25 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-19 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-18 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-04-06 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS/SBs 661, 726 & 741) S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (5051S.02C) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 661-Dixon |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |