MO SB660 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the law relating to mental health

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the law relating to mental health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 660 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 660 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: SB 660 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01SenateSigned by Governor
2018-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2018-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2018-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2018-05-17SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2018-05-17SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2018-05-17SenateH adopts CCR
2018-05-17SenateReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2018-05-17SenateVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2018-05-15HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2018-05-15HouseCCR S offered & adopted (Riddle)
2018-05-14HouseReferred H Fiscal Review
2018-05-14HouseH distributes CCR (4178S04.01F)
2018-05-10HouseChange in House conferees appointed: Fitzwater, Ruth, Franklin*, Walker(74), Stevens(46)
2018-05-08HouseSenate conferees appointed: Riddle, Sater, Hegeman, Schupp, Holsman
2018-05-08HouseHouse conferees: Fitzwater, Ruth, Haefner, Walker(74), Stevens(46)
2018-05-08HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2018-05-08HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
2018-04-30HouseH Third Read and Passed
2018-04-30HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2018-04-30HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Neely)--(4178H02.10H)
2018-04-30HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Helms)--(4178H02.06H)
2018-04-30HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Evans)--(4178H02.08H)
2018-04-30HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruth)--(4178H02.09H)
2018-04-30HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haefner)--(4178H02.04H)
2018-04-24HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-04-23HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-04-17HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-04-17HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy
2018-04-11HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy
2018-04-04HouseHearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy
2018-03-29HouseReferred H Health and Mental Health Policy
2018-03-08HouseH Second Read
2018-03-07HouseH First Read
2018-03-07SenateS Third Read and Passed
2018-03-01SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2018-03-01SenatePerfected
2018-02-21SenateReported from S Health and Pensions Committee
2018-02-19SenateRemoved S Consent Calendar
2018-02-15SenateReported from S Health and Pensions Committee - Consent
2018-02-14SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Health and Pensions Committee - Consent vote adopted
2018-02-14SenateVoted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee
2018-01-31SenateHearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
2018-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 660-Riddle
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback