MO SB655 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to Missouri Local Government Employees' Retirement System in order to provide for coverage of certain employee classes
Title
Modifies provisions relating to Missouri Local Government Employees' Retirement System in order to provide for coverage of certain employee classes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-13 - House - House: SB 655 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-05-18 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2022-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2022-05-13 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2022-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Pensions |
2022-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass H Pensions |
2022-04-13 | House | Hearing Conducted H Pensions |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred H Pensions |
2022-03-21 | House | H Second Read |
2022-03-10 | House | H First Read |
2022-03-10 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Perfected |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Health and Pensions Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |