MO SB655 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Higher Education Capital Fund to provide matching funds to public colleges and universities for capital projects under certain circumstances
Title
Creates the Higher Education Capital Fund to provide matching funds to public colleges and universities for capital projects under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Chappelle-Nadal [D] | Sen. Timothy Green [D] | Rep. Chris Kelly [D] | Sen. Kurt Schaefer [R] |
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS | |
2012-05-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-14 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-08 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-26 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-04 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Higher Education Committee | |
2012-04-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Higher Education Committee | |
2012-04-03 | Hearing Conducted H Higher Education Committee | |
2012-03-27 | Re-referred H Higher Education Committee | |
2012-03-22 | Referred H Budget Committee | |
2012-03-05 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-01 | H First Read | |
2012-03-01 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-02-29 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Perfected | |
2012-02-28 | SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2012-02-28 | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schaefer)--(4680S02.05S) | |
2012-02-16 | Reported from S Appropriations Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-02-08 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Appropriations Committee - (4680S.02C) | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing Conducted S Appropriations Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Appropriations Committee | |
2012-01-12 | S First Read--SB 655-Green, et al |