MO SB651 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Pending: Senate Financial And Governmental Organizations And Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Pending: Senate Financial And Governmental Organizations And Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a home inspector licensing board and procedures for licensing home inspectors
Title
Creates a home inspector licensing board and procedures for licensing home inspectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing Cancelled S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-02-20 | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-01-12 | S First Read--SB 651-Schaefer |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=134149 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB651.pdf |