MO SB639 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 639-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 639-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions on the preservation of records by the Secretary of State
Title
Modifies provisions on the preservation of records by the Secretary of State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 639-Riddle |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 639-Riddle |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26837979 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB639.pdf |