MO SB63 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 44 & 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 44 & 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that each school district may rely on technical coursework and skills assessments developed for industry-recognized certificates and credentials when establishing career and technical education offerings
Title
Provides that each school district may rely on technical coursework and skills assessments developed for industry-recognized certificates and credentials when establishing career and technical education offerings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 44 & 63) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 63-Hegeman |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57095350 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB63.pdf |