MO SB629 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing
Title
Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] | Rep. Rocky Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 629 (HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 84 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 50) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 629 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 629 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-17 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-17 | House | HA 2 H offered & defeated (Stacy)--(4485S03.15H) |
2018-05-17 | House | HA 1 H offered & defeated (Washington)--(4485S03.03H) |
2018-05-11 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-11 | House | Bill placed back on Formal Calendar |
2018-04-30 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Economic Development |
2018-04-03 | House | Voted Do Pass H Economic Development |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing Conducted H Economic Development |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred H Economic Development |
2018-02-20 | House | H Second Read |
2018-02-19 | House | H First Read |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-12 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee w/SCS |
2018-01-30 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (4485S.03C) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 629-Wasson |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |