MO SB627 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - Hearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - Hearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes campaign contribution limits
Title
Establishes campaign contribution limits
Sponsors
Sen. Paul LeVota [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 627-LeVota |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27723811 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB627.pdf |