MO SB621 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 621-Brown, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 621-Brown, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends various provisions regarding the licensure and inspection of hospitals
Title
Amends various provisions regarding the licensure and inspection of hospitals
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 621-Brown, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending) | |
2012-03-22 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-03-22 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(5052S03.04S) | |
2012-02-29 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-02-29 | Taken up for Perfection | |
2012-02-20 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-02-20 | SS for SCS S offered (Brown)--(5052S.03F) | |
2012-02-16 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-02-13 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (5052S.02C) | |
2012-02-06 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-01-09 | S First Read--SB 621-Brown |