MO SB620 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
Pending: Senate Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
Pending: Senate Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and creates new provisions relating to unlawful discriminatory practices
Title
Modifies and creates new provisions relating to unlawful discriminatory practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 620-Hummel |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69471960 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB620.pdf |