MO SB618 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the detention and shackling of juvenile offenders and detention and shackling of pregnant offenders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the detention and shackling of juvenile offenders and detention and shackling of pregnant offenders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-13HouseH Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
2016-05-09HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Reveiw
2016-05-09HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2016-05-04HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2016-05-02HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9)
2016-04-28HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9)
2016-04-26HouseReferred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9)
2016-04-26HouseReported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/HCA 1
2016-04-25HouseVoted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/Amendments
2016-04-20HouseHearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings
2016-04-14HouseReferred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings
2016-04-12HouseH Second Read
2016-04-11HouseH First Read
2016-04-11SenateS Third Read and Passed
2016-04-06SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2016-04-06SenatePerfected
2016-04-06SenateSCS, as amended, S adopted
2016-04-06SenateSA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(4658S06.01S)
2016-04-06SenateSA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Nasheed)--(4658S06.03S)
2016-04-06SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(4658S06.04S)
2016-02-25SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS
2016-02-25SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4658S.06C)
2016-02-10SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2016-01-07SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2016-01-06SenateS First Read--SB 618-Wallingford
2015-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback