MO SB612 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] | Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | No motion to override Governor's veto |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2014-05-13 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-13 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (4820S04.2SR) |
2014-05-08 | House | H submits CCR (4820S04.2SR) |
2014-05-07 | House | CORRECTED H conferees: Hoskins, Miller, Dunn |
2014-05-06 | House | H conferees appointed: Hoskins, Mitten, Dunn |
2014-05-06 | House | S conferees appointed: Schaaf, Kraus, Lamping, Sifton, LeVota |
2014-05-06 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2014-04-30 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2014-04-30 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 & HA 5 |
2014-04-30 | House | EC adopted |
2014-04-29 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 5 H offered & adopted (Miller)--(4820S02.10H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 4 H offered & adopted (Flanigan)--(4820S02.07H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Koenig)--(4820S02.14H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Kelley-127)--(4820S02.11H) |
2014-04-29 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Jones-50)--(4820S02.18H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Urban Issues Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass Special Standing Committee on Urban Issues Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Standing Committee on Urban Issues Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred H Special Standing Committee on Urban Issues Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | H Second Read |
2014-03-13 | House | H First Read |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-03-10 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-02-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (4820S.02C) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 612-Schaaf |
2013-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled |